FINDING RHYTHMS

Charity number: 1151872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £157.68k £161.14k £185.52k £164.96k £192.55k
Total expenditure £171.43k £148.15k £157.56k £168.70k £99.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £2.50k N/A £33.75k N/A
Income from government grants £40.65k £0 N/A N/A N/A