Trustees FINDING RHYTHMS

Charity number: 1151872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisbeth Jon Davies Kinsella Chair 12 December 2019
None on record
Robin Harris Trustee 08 January 2021
None on record
Michael John Conway Trustee 12 December 2019
SPARK INSIDE
Received: On time
JOHN LLOYD REISS Trustee 30 July 2018
MOUNTVIEW ACADEMY OF THEATRE ARTS LIMITED
Received: On time
MYKAELL RILEY Trustee 30 July 2018
None on record
Kieron Tilley Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
David Christopher Jenkins Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record