Trustees HWLincs
Charity number: 1154835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michele Duggan | Chair | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Jago | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ward | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Staniland | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ball | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rhodes | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Prior | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Victor Green | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.