Accounts and annual returns STEYNING AREA YOUTH SERVICE

Charity number: 1152572
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 246 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 246 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 17 March 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 17 March 2021 44 days late
Annual return 01 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Annual return 01 April 2018 25 June 2019 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1342 days
Annual return 01 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time