Accounts and annual returns Torus Foundation

Charity number: 1152903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window