Trustees Torus Foundation

Charity number: 1152903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Saunders Chair 01 January 2019
None on record
Stephanie Donaldson Trustee 06 June 2022
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC FINANCE AND ACCOUNTANCY
Received: On time
Simon Bean Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Clare Gosling Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Uzair Patel Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Anthony Okotie Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Holly Chan Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Councillor Jeanie Bell Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Catherine Murray-Howard Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
Phillip Garrigan Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record