CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOUTH TYNESIDE

Charity number: 1153612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £54.49k £62.70k £93.99k £79.82k £196.15k
Total expenditure £42.49k £65.94k £78.53k £97.83k £98.82k
Income from government contracts £11.00k £11.00k £11.00k £11.00k £11.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £11.00k N/A £32.00k