THE COLIN MCMILLAN BOXING TRAINING ACADEMY

Charity number: 1151956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.65k £13.70k £16.48k £12.68k £8.50k
Total expenditure £13.96k £13.35k £16.22k £12.51k £7.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A