TOGETHER LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1151977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ELLEN LOUDON Chair 28 September 2016
LIVERPOOL CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
MICAH LIVERPOOL Received: On time
David Anthony Randall Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
David Bishop Trustee 06 September 2016 None on record
Andrea McGanity Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
PROF HILARY ENID RUSSELL Trustee 18 April 2013
FEEDING LIVERPOOL Recently registered
Richard Anthony Bennett Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Rev Peter Hendry Spiers Trustee 01 June 2020
SEFTON COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE Received: On time
Lorna Mary Randall Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
peter Bull Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record