LORETO EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1160672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £50.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £12.00k
Total expenditure £2.27k £763 £5.24k £3.66k £1.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A