Accounts and annual returns LONDON CENTRAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1152527
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 September 2020 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 September 2020 313 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 December 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 December 2017 31 days late Download Open in new window