Financial history LONDON CENTRAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1152527
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.98k £97.96k £82.23k £80.81k £57.35k
Total expenditure £82.68k £94.63k £87.95k £81.03k £55.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A