AFRICAN CARRIBBEAN DENTAL ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1157068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 January 2020 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required