Financial history ARF TRUST

Charity number: 1157874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/07/2017 15/07/2018 15/07/2019 15/07/2020 15/07/2021
Total gross income £3.32k £14.43k £11.60k £9.65k £8.04k
Total expenditure £2.34k £8.71k £18.25k £10.53k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A