KING'S CHURCH MEDWAY

Charity number: 1152477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £416.17k £410.68k £388.06k £454.41k £526.59k
Total expenditure £416.22k £373.06k £398.61k £426.69k £427.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £521.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.66k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £193
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £427.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0