SKY HIGH TRAMPOLINE GYMNASTICS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1152878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £313.00k £288.15k £344.41k £394.25k £328.06k
Total expenditure £270.08k £306.69k £389.82k £445.58k £310.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £83.00k