Trustees AFRICAN CENTRE FOR DEVELOPMENT AND RESEARCH

Charity number: 1154206
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BABATUNDE ROSANWO Chair 30 December 2017
None on record
Adeola Ojeniyi Founder Trustee 10 September 2015
PECULIAR PEOPLES' PALACE MINISTRIES
Overdue by 141 days
OYEGOKE ADEBOYE Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
Abraham ISAH Trustee 13 March 2015
None on record
Taiwo Ibikunle Trustee 15 April 2013
CENTRE FOR POLICY DEVELOPMENT AND ADVOCACY
Overdue by 111 days