TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON SPIRITUAL MISSION

Charity number: 1152206
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 May 2021 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 May 2021 184 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 February 2017 On time Download