ADVOCACY NOW

Charity number: 1152359
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £155.18k £154.46k £168.44k £159.09k £154.41k
Total expenditure £156.96k £159.64k £165.54k £166.21k £171.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £47.08k N/A £50.00k N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £0 £72.94k N/A £42.23k