ADVOCACY NOW

Charity number: 1152359
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Barrett Trustee 07 January 2020 None on record
SIMON ROUSE Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Stephen Peter Stembalski Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
Robin Kelly Trustee 04 September 2020 None on record
Brian Tan Trustee 06 July 2017 None on record
BABATUNDE OLUDOTUN SOBOWALE Trustee 23 March 2021 None on record
Freda Kelly Chair 16 February 2017 None on record