Accounts and annual returns WESTWAY OPEN ARMS

Charity number: 1153919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window