JADE YOUTH & COMMUNITY LTD

Charity number: 1153785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 14 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 18 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 06 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download