JADE YOUTH & COMMUNITY LTD

Charity number: 1153785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £151.34k £151.10k £252.31k £201.30k £370.13k
Total expenditure £141.88k £165.96k £220.65k £231.78k £254.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A