Trustees ETHNIC YOUTH SUPPORT TEAM

Charity number: 1152486
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shehla Khan Chair 17 January 2018
ETHNIC MINORITY WELSH WOMEN ACHIEVEMENT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Firdaws Tahirah Ali Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Fatiha Rahman Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Kyriaki Korina Tsioni Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Mark Alaszewski Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
Abdul-Azim Ahmed Trustee 31 May 2019
None on record
Hywel Vaughan Trustee 08 February 2017
None on record