SAVILE TOWN SURTEE WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152289
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 October 2016 On time Download