SAVILE TOWN SURTEE WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152289
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £75.85k £49.44k £124.41k £127.27k £128.93k
Total expenditure £44.96k £41.75k £107.43k £122.34k £122.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A