KINGS LYNN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 July 2020 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 July 2020 168 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 August 2016 On time Download