BETHESDA CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.93k £17.80k £17.11k £31.83k £34.85k
Total expenditure £13.45k £16.49k £18.82k £31.46k £33.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A