LONDON SCHOOL OF SUPERNATURAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1152393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time Download