Trustees ASTON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1152067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Atul Rana | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Allan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taher Mustafa Gadiwala | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juan Carlos Garcia Bleza | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee James Marsham | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee James Robert | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arun Shoker | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kwan Yuet Adora Wong | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum Roberts | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anton Schwarz | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.