Governing document ROTHER RESPONDERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2015 as amended on 04 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN THE ROTHER AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINED VOLUNTEER COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES, AS DIRECTED BY SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICE TO INCREASE THE SURVIVAL RATE OF OUT OF HOSPITAL CARDIAC ARRESTS THROUGH PLACEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATORS IN THE ROTHER AREA TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF FIRST AID, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY OFFERING TRAINING IN CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION AND DEFIBRILLATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.