BARDSLEY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1152836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Elizabeth Lepoidevin Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
Janet Powell Trustee 14 June 2021 None on record
Rev Steven Medley Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Geoffrey William Wilcox Trustee 03 October 2018 None on record
ERIC JAMES BREMNER Chair 08 January 2018 None on record
Andrew Williams Trustee 16 June 2014 None on record
Rev Dexter Bracey Trustee 11 March 2019
COVENTRY STREET PASTORS INITIATIVE Received: On time