Trustees THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1152244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Her Honour Frances Margaret Kirkham CBE Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Dr Partheepan Narendran Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Adrian John Roddick Trustee 30 January 2020
None on record
Steve Page Trustee 30 January 2019
None on record
VERY REV MATT THOMPSON Trustee 19 June 2018
THE FRIENDS OF BIRMINGHAM CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ST PHILIP'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ST BASIL'S
Received: On time
THE GRANTHAM YORKE TRUST
Received: On time
MARTIN HAMILTON DYKE Trustee 19 June 2018
LIMOGES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 2 days late
REV NICK TUCKER Trustee 19 June 2018
DAILY PRAYER UNION CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev MICHELE KITTO Trustee 19 June 2018
WATCH (WOMEN AND THE CHURCH)
Received: On time
WILLIAM GUY SHUBRA HORDERN Trustee 19 June 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, EDGBASTON
Received: On time
BERNARD HUGH SINGLETON Trustee 19 June 2018
THE ROTARY CLUB OF EDGBASTON CHARITABLE FUND
Overdue by 110 days
KARAN DIEDRE GILMORE Trustee 19 June 2018
NEWMAN UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
Emma Cook Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
STEPHEN MICHAEL RAINE Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Anita Poole Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record