BEANIBAZAR EDUCATION TRUST UK

Charity number: 1154075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.88k £2.02k £3.14k £1.70k £1.20k
Total expenditure £1.29k £0 £2.72k £588 £414
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A