SUNNAH AID

Charity number: 1153864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £14.69k £1.65k £1.51k £1.37k £2.35k
Total expenditure £14.33k £1.71k £1.17k £1.35k £1.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A