TAS VALLEY CELL CHURCH

Charity number: 1152589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.52k £16.34k £10.69k £11.73k £8.82k
Total expenditure £13.77k £18.94k £17.47k £11.71k £11.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A