Financial history AB FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £163.42k £299.98k £247.81k £92.88k £143.01k
Total expenditure £196.34k £134.87k £233.17k £81.69k £112.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A