BD4 COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1152702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download