ANIMAL RESCUE CUMBRIA (THE WAINWRIGHT SHELTER) CIO

Charity number: 1153737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £173.22k £418.95k £527.79k £401.31k £372.78k
Total expenditure £133.74k £183.58k £201.35k £226.87k £268.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £446.74k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £19.55k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £61.49k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £359.70k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £189.55k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £11.80k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.73k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £8.94k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A