WATLING UBUNTU FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.31k £13.84k £10.60k £5.60k £8.35k
Total expenditure £12.87k £13.31k £10.54k £5.53k £8.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A