LONGTOWN MEMORIAL HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1153110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £104.58k £130.92k £101.92k £116.93k £49.18k
Total expenditure £98.93k £104.43k £131.58k £108.24k £46.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.39k £32.26k £27.99k £54.48k N/A