Trustees 5TH PENWORTHAM SCOUT GROUP (UNITED REFORMED CHURCH)

Charity number: 503845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Howarth Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Julie Hainsworth Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Margaret Allison Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Sarah Gunning Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Susan Sullivan Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Andy Chester Trustee 10 February 2015
None on record
MICHAEL SULLIVAN Trustee 01 August 1995
None on record