ST. MONICA'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1152590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 July 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download