Financial history UZIMA IN OUR HANDS

Charity number: 1153181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £66.53k £70.83k £93.95k £154.19k £133.19k
Total expenditure £63.03k £68.44k £101.57k £136.63k £70.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A