MINERS COMMUNITY ARTS AND MUSIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1154459
Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 126 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 126 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 22 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required