Financial history PORTUGUESE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1157249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.00k £18.45k £16.37k £19.06k £16.89k
Total expenditure £23.90k £15.96k £14.07k £16.40k £32.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A