Financial history UBS OPTIMUS FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1153537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.32m £14.25m £16.16m £26.64m £30.64m
Total expenditure £5.85m £10.41m £16.11m £25.81m £29.72m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.30m £14.19m £16.01m £26.57m £30.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.28k £58.83k £146.03k £71.90k £52.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.85m £10.41m £16.11m £25.81m £29.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.45k £26.51k £36.46k £0 £59.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.72m £10.28m £16.05m £0 £29.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0