RINGLESTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1154020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CORAL STIMSON Trustee 08 July 2013 None on record
HEATHER TAYLOR Trustee 08 July 2013 None on record
Ruth Elizabeth Pannell Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
ELIZABETH DRUKER Trustee 08 July 2013 None on record
ROSEMARY HENN-MACRAE Trustee 08 July 2013 None on record
Keith Paul Settle Trustee 20 October 2020
THE FRIENDS OF WATERINGBURY PRIMARY SCHOOL Received: On time
Robert Illingworth Trustee 16 March 2016 None on record
SIR JOHN YOUNG Trustee 08 July 2013 None on record
Frances Butler Trustee 27 January 2016 None on record
REV CANON ARTHUR HOUSTON Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record