ST NEOTS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download