ST NEOTS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.70k £15.55k £15.06k £34.11k £76.65k
Total expenditure £5.04k £5.75k £10.22k £13.96k £27.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.00k N/A N/A